Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3664.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3712.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3341.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3215.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|