LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1217
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1217
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1217
Compare Versions
SB1217 Amended July 2, 2014
SB1217 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1217 Amended May 7, 2014
SB1217 Amended April 21, 2014
SB1217 Amended April 10, 2014
SB1217 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1217 Amended July 2, 2014
SB1217 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1217 Amended May 7, 2014
SB1217 Amended April 21, 2014
SB1217 Amended April 10, 2014
SB1217 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare