California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 7, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014