Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on U. & C. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1096.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1007.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 639.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 389.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|