LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB124
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB124
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB124
Compare Versions
SB124 Chaptered March 25, 2014
SB124 Enrolled March 24, 2014
SB124 Amended March 17, 2014
SB124 Amended February 25, 2014
SB124 Amended August 5, 2013
SB124 Amended April 29, 2013
SB124 Amended April 10, 2013
SB124 Introduced January 18, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB124 Chaptered March 25, 2014
SB124 Enrolled March 24, 2014
SB124 Amended March 17, 2014
SB124 Amended February 25, 2014
SB124 Amended August 5, 2013
SB124 Amended April 29, 2013
SB124 Amended April 10, 2013
SB124 Introduced January 18, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare