California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB124 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2013

Enrolled

Bill March 24, 2014

Chaptered

Bill March 25, 2014

Amended

Bill March 17, 2014
Bill February 25, 2014
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill April 29, 2013
Bill April 10, 2013