California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB124 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/24/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SB 124ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE MARCH 24, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MARCH 20, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 25, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 5, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 29, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 10, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Corbett JANUARY 18, 2013 An act relating to human remains, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 124, Corbett. Human remains: Abbot Archimandrite Theodor Micka. Existing law requires the local registrar of births and deaths, if the certificate of death is properly executed and completed, to issue a permit for disposition that specifies where the burial or interment will take place. This bill, notwithstanding the above requirement or any other law, would authorize the local registrar of births and deaths in the County of Alameda to issue a disposition permit for the burial of Abbot, Archimandrite Theodor Micka, on the grounds of the Holy Cross Monastery in the County of Alameda and would allow those remains to be so interred. The bill would make legislative findings and declarations as to the necessity of a special statute for the County of Alameda. This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as an urgency statute. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Notwithstanding Sections 7054 and 103055 of the Health and Safety Code, or any other law, the local registrar of births and deaths in the County of Alameda may issue a disposition permit for the burial of the Abbot, Archimandrite Theodor Micka, on the grounds of the Holy Cross Monastery in the County of Alameda and those remains may be so interred. SEC. 2. The Legislature finds and declares that, because of the unique circumstances applicable only to the County of Alameda, a special law is necessary and that a general law cannot be made applicable within the meaning of Section 16 of Article IV of the California Constitution. SEC. 3. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order that the Abbot, Archimandrite Theodor Micka, may be interred upon his death, it is necessary that this bill take immediate effect.