|
09/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4946.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6545.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6284.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on ED. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3663.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3713.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3280.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Set for hearing April 24 in HEALTH pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3035.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED., HEALTH, and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|