LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1266
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1266
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1266
Compare Versions
SB1266 Chaptered September 15, 2014
SB1266 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB1266 Amended August 21, 2014
SB1266 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1266 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1266 Amended July 1, 2014
SB1266 Amended June 17, 2014
SB1266 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1266 Amended May 6, 2014
SB1266 Amended April 21, 2014
SB1266 Amended March 24, 2014
SB1266 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1266 Chaptered September 15, 2014
SB1266 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB1266 Amended August 21, 2014
SB1266 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1266 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1266 Amended July 1, 2014
SB1266 Amended June 17, 2014
SB1266 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1266 Amended May 6, 2014
SB1266 Amended April 21, 2014
SB1266 Amended March 24, 2014
SB1266 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare