California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1266 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 17, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014