|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 283, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1945.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2481.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1171.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1007.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 661.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|