LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB134
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB134
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB134
Compare Versions
SB134 Chaptered September 9, 2013
SB134 Enrolled August 23, 2013
SB134 Amended August 5, 2013
SB134 Amended May 28, 2013
SB134 Amended April 8, 2013
SB134 Introduced January 28, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB134 Chaptered September 9, 2013
SB134 Enrolled August 23, 2013
SB134 Amended August 5, 2013
SB134 Amended May 28, 2013
SB134 Amended April 8, 2013
SB134 Introduced January 28, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare