California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB134 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013

Amended

Bill August 5, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013