|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4411.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 5907.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on ED.) suspended. (Page 5606.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 3699.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3715.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3036.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|