LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1349
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1349
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1349
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 21, 2014
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 12, 2014
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
August 22, 2014
Compare
Amended
Bill
July 1, 2014
Compare
Bill
May 28, 2014
Compare
Bill
May 27, 2014
Compare
Bill
April 23, 2014
Compare
Bill
April 9, 2014
Compare
Bill
March 26, 2014
Compare