LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1349
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1349
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1349
Compare Versions
SB1349 Chaptered August 22, 2014
SB1349 Enrolled August 12, 2014
SB1349 Amended July 1, 2014
SB1349 Amended May 28, 2014
SB1349 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1349 Amended April 23, 2014
SB1349 Amended April 9, 2014
SB1349 Amended March 26, 2014
SB1349 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1349 Chaptered August 22, 2014
SB1349 Enrolled August 12, 2014
SB1349 Amended July 1, 2014
SB1349 Amended May 28, 2014
SB1349 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1349 Amended April 23, 2014
SB1349 Amended April 9, 2014
SB1349 Amended March 26, 2014
SB1349 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare