|
09/24/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 342, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2437.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3320.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3167.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3167.) From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 11). Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2951.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1111.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1007.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 641.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 464.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|