LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB135
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB135
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB135
Compare Versions
SB135 Chaptered September 24, 2013
SB135 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB135 Amended September 11, 2013
SB135 Amended September 6, 2013
SB135 Amended September 3, 2013
SB135 Amended August 14, 2013
SB135 Amended May 24, 2013
SB135 Amended April 2, 2013
SB135 Introduced January 28, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB135 Chaptered September 24, 2013
SB135 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB135 Amended September 11, 2013
SB135 Amended September 6, 2013
SB135 Amended September 3, 2013
SB135 Amended August 14, 2013
SB135 Amended May 24, 2013
SB135 Amended April 2, 2013
SB135 Introduced January 28, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare