California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB135 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2013

Amended

Bill September 11, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 14, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013