|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 928, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4913.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6490.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3660.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3716.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3342.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3281.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30 in E.Q. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q. Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|