California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1395 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill June 26, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill March 25, 2014