LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1395
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1395
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1395
Compare Versions
SB1395 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB1395 Enrolled August 29, 2014
SB1395 Amended June 26, 2014
SB1395 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1395 Amended March 25, 2014
SB1395 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1395 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB1395 Enrolled August 29, 2014
SB1395 Amended June 26, 2014
SB1395 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1395 Amended March 25, 2014
SB1395 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare