|
10/05/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 576, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2377.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 3178.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 2952.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1096.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1007.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 785.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|