LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB141
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB141
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB141
Compare Versions
SB141 Chaptered October 5, 2013
SB141 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB141 Amended September 6, 2013
SB141 Amended September 3, 2013
SB141 Amended August 8, 2013
SB141 Amended May 8, 2013
SB141 Amended April 25, 2013
SB141 Amended April 11, 2013
SB141 Amended March 12, 2013
SB141 Introduced January 29, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB141 Chaptered October 5, 2013
SB141 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB141 Amended September 6, 2013
SB141 Amended September 3, 2013
SB141 Amended August 8, 2013
SB141 Amended May 8, 2013
SB141 Amended April 25, 2013
SB141 Amended April 11, 2013
SB141 Amended March 12, 2013
SB141 Introduced January 29, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare