California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB141 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 8, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 25, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill March 12, 2013