|
08/19/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1651.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 2242.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2243.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 36. Noes 30. Page 2190.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gonzalez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 308.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 291.) (March 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Set for hearing March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|