LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB146
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB146
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB146
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 31, 2013
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 2, 2013
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
August 19, 2013
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 13, 2013
Compare
Bill
March 6, 2013
Compare