LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB146
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB146
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB146
Compare Versions
SB146 Chaptered August 19, 2013
SB146 Enrolled August 2, 2013
SB146 Amended June 13, 2013
SB146 Amended March 6, 2013
SB146 Introduced January 31, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB146 Chaptered August 19, 2013
SB146 Enrolled August 2, 2013
SB146 Amended June 13, 2013
SB146 Amended March 6, 2013
SB146 Introduced January 31, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare