|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 551, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4948.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Set for hearing August 27. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4924.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4868.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 6232.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 867.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 790.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|