LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB18
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB18
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB18
Compare Versions
SB18 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB18 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB18 Amended August 18, 2014
SB18 Amended June 30, 2014
SB18 Amended June 18, 2014
SB18 Amended April 17, 2013
SB18 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB18 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB18 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB18 Amended August 18, 2014
SB18 Amended June 30, 2014
SB18 Amended June 18, 2014
SB18 Amended April 17, 2013
SB18 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare