California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB18 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill April 17, 2013