|
10/05/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 600, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2036.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 2720.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2671.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 2249.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 808.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 755.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 506.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|