LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB191
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB191
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB191
Compare Versions
SB191 Chaptered October 5, 2013
SB191 Enrolled September 3, 2013
SB191 Amended August 22, 2013
SB191 Amended June 25, 2013
SB191 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB191 Chaptered October 5, 2013
SB191 Enrolled September 3, 2013
SB191 Amended August 22, 2013
SB191 Amended June 25, 2013
SB191 Introduced February 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare