California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB191 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013