Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (September 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3032.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2791.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1177.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1008.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 485.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|