LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB208
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB208
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB208
Compare Versions
SB208 Chaptered October 8, 2013
SB208 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB208 Amended September 6, 2013
SB208 Amended August 30, 2013
SB208 Amended May 28, 2013
SB208 Amended April 11, 2013
SB208 Amended March 14, 2013
SB208 Introduced February 8, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB208 Chaptered October 8, 2013
SB208 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB208 Amended September 6, 2013
SB208 Amended August 30, 2013
SB208 Amended May 28, 2013
SB208 Amended April 11, 2013
SB208 Amended March 14, 2013
SB208 Introduced February 8, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare