California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB208 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill August 30, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill March 14, 2013