|
07/10/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4145.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5548.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2638.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2599.) (January 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2014
|
Set for hearing January 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|