California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB245 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2013

Enrolled

Bill June 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 10, 2014

Amended

Bill June 11, 2014
Bill January 22, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill April 1, 2013