LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB245
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB245
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB245
Compare Versions
SB245 Chaptered July 10, 2014
SB245 Enrolled June 26, 2014
SB245 Amended June 11, 2014
SB245 Amended January 22, 2014
SB245 Amended January 6, 2014
SB245 Amended April 1, 2013
SB245 Introduced February 12, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB245 Chaptered July 10, 2014
SB245 Enrolled June 26, 2014
SB245 Amended June 11, 2014
SB245 Amended January 22, 2014
SB245 Amended January 6, 2014
SB245 Amended April 1, 2013
SB245 Introduced February 12, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare