|
09/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 388, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2409.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 3223.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2956.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1177.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1009.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 565.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|