California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB254 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 4, 2013
Bill August 26, 2013
Bill August 19, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013