LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB254
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB254
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB254
Compare Versions
SB254 Chaptered September 27, 2013
SB254 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB254 Amended September 6, 2013
SB254 Amended September 4, 2013
SB254 Amended August 26, 2013
SB254 Amended August 19, 2013
SB254 Amended August 6, 2013
SB254 Amended May 28, 2013
SB254 Amended April 15, 2013
SB254 Amended April 1, 2013
SB254 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB254 Chaptered September 27, 2013
SB254 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB254 Amended September 6, 2013
SB254 Amended September 4, 2013
SB254 Amended August 26, 2013
SB254 Amended August 19, 2013
SB254 Amended August 6, 2013
SB254 Amended May 28, 2013
SB254 Amended April 15, 2013
SB254 Amended April 1, 2013
SB254 Introduced February 13, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare