|
05/14/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 3414.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 4764.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 4428.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Urgency clause refused adoption. Senate refused to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 2915.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Correa. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2915.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3871.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 3622.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2014
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1114.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1005.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 749.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|