California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB27 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2014

Chaptered

Bill May 14, 2014

Amended

Bill April 10, 2014
Bill January 17, 2014
Bill August 21, 2013
Bill August 7, 2013
Bill July 2, 2013
Bill May 6, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013