LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB27
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB27
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB27
Compare Versions
SB27 Chaptered May 14, 2014
SB27 Enrolled May 9, 2014
SB27 Amended April 10, 2014
SB27 Amended January 17, 2014
SB27 Amended August 21, 2013
SB27 Amended August 7, 2013
SB27 Amended July 2, 2013
SB27 Amended May 6, 2013
SB27 Amended April 9, 2013
SB27 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB27 Chaptered May 14, 2014
SB27 Enrolled May 9, 2014
SB27 Amended April 10, 2014
SB27 Amended January 17, 2014
SB27 Amended August 21, 2013
SB27 Amended August 7, 2013
SB27 Amended July 2, 2013
SB27 Amended May 6, 2013
SB27 Amended April 9, 2013
SB27 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare