|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 618, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4869.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 6406.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6222.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1095.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1005.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 325.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|