California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB29 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill August 11, 2014
Bill June 27, 2013
Bill June 10, 2013
Bill March 6, 2013