LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB29
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB29
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB29
Compare Versions
SB29 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB29 Enrolled August 28, 2014
SB29 Amended August 20, 2014
SB29 Amended August 11, 2014
SB29 Amended June 27, 2013
SB29 Amended June 10, 2013
SB29 Amended March 6, 2013
SB29 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB29 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB29 Enrolled August 28, 2014
SB29 Amended August 20, 2014
SB29 Amended August 11, 2014
SB29 Amended June 27, 2013
SB29 Amended June 10, 2013
SB29 Amended March 6, 2013
SB29 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare