|
10/04/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 542, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2362.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2971.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2670.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 713.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 616.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 487.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|